EP0645298 - Wheel axle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB VOLVO 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [1998/24] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states AB VOLVO Assar Gabrielssons väg, Torslanda S-405 08 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states AB VOLVO S-405 08 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bodin, Jan-Olof Hultebackavägen 94 S-441 65 Alingsas / SE | 02 /
Dagh, Ingemar Halmgatan 9 S-422 47 Hisingsbacka / SE | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Hellbom, Lars Olof, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Hellbom, Lars Olof, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94118161.2 | 13.12.1991 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | SE19900004021 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: SE 9004021 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0645298 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0645298 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645298 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/18 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
B60B27/001 (EP);
B60T1/065 (EP);
B62D7/18 (EP);
F16D65/123 (EP);
F16D2055/0008 (EP);
F16D2065/1328 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1995/13] | B62D7/06, B62D7/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | Radachse | [1995/13] | English: | Wheel axle | [1995/13] | French: | Essieu de roue | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 15.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92901404.1 / EP0561950 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 18.11.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.1995 | 02.05.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3441288 (L.G. BOUGHNER) [Y] 1-3; | [Y]US3801124 (AFANADOR ET EL) [Y] 1-3; | [A]US1783614 (W.R. GRISWOLD) [A] 1-3; | [A]US2242048 (C.S. ASH) [A] 1-3; | [A]US2652264 (J.H. BOOTH ET AL) [A] 1-3; | [A]DE2624704 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1-3 |