EP0658517 - Homogeneous mixtures of silicate and carbonate of alcali metal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerner, Dieter, Dr. Am Hexenpfad 21 D-63450 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Klotz, Oswin Bayernstrasse 14 D-63825 Westerngrund / DE | 03 /
Lortz, Wolfgang, Dr. Feldstrasse 9 D-63607 Wächtersbach / DE | 04 /
Powell, Sigrid Waldstrasse 25 D-63579 Freigericht / DE | [1995/25] | Application number, filing date | 94118177.8 | 18.11.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | DE19934339803 | 23.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4339803 | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658517 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C02F5/00, C11D3/08, C01B33/20 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
C11D7/12 (EP);
C02F5/00 (EP);
C11D7/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/25] | Title | German: | Homogene Alkalisilikat/Alkalikarbonat-Mischungen | [1995/25] | English: | Homogeneous mixtures of silicate and carbonate of alcali metal | [1995/25] | French: | Mélanges homogènes de silicate et de carbonate de métal alcalin | [1995/25] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 18.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 18.11.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2143093 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL COMPANY) [X] 1-3 * claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [DX]EP0486078 (EKA NOBEL AB) [DX] 1-4 * claims 1,4-6 *; | [A]EP0486079 (EKA NOBEL AB) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 36 - line 38 * * page 2, line 49 - line 51; claims 1,3-5 *; | [A]FR2183132 (DIAMOND SHAMROCK) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4288342 (J. E. WAGNER ET AL.) [A] 1,5 * claim 1 *; | [A]GB1346227 (DESOTO); | [A]GB1595770 (UNILEVER) |