EP0654400 - Diving jacket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leibundgut, Felix Hohentwielstrasse 6 D-78250 Tengen / DE | [1995/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [1995/21] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat. Patentanwalt, Zeppelinstrasse 4 D-78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118185.1 | 18.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | DE19930017579U | 18.11.1993 Original published format: DE 9317579 U | [1995/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654400 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654400 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B63C9/125 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
B63C9/1255 (EP);
B63C11/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/21] | Title | German: | Tauchjacket | [1995/21] | English: | Diving jacket | [1995/21] | French: | Gilet de plongée | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.09.1998 | IT | 09.09.1998 | SE | 09.12.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 09.09.1998 | |
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | SE | 09.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1478351 (JAMES O'SHAUGHNESSY LAUGHLIN) [X] 1-6 * column W *; | [X]US3046576 (JOST BERNHARDT) [X] 1-3 * column W *; | [X]US3354480 (JONATHAN HARDING, et al) [X] 1-6 * column W *; | [X]US3497889 (MELLIN JOHN J JR, et al) [X] 1-6 * column W *; | [X]GB1280533 (VITAFOAM LTD) [X] 1-3 * column W *; | [X]US3903555 (BUSBY DAISY H) [X] 1-3* column W *; | [X]GB2223987 (CREWSAVER LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * |