EP0654623 - Hydraulic control system for automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-0028 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fucho-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 735 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuriyama, Minoru, No. 28, 1122-Banchi Oaza-Nakashima, Takaya-cho, Higashi-Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken 729-17 / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Kazuo, No. 102 Yamamoto Bldg. 5-12, Miyuki 3-chome, Ujina, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken 734 / JP | 03 /
Takaba, Tetsuro 22-5, Hirooshingai 2-chome Kure-shi, Hiroshima-ken 737-01 / JP | 04 /
Nishizato, Tetsuya No. 637 Mazda-Fleur-Sakurao, 2-43, Sakurao 2-chome Hatsukaichi-shi, Hiroshima-ken 738 / JP | 05 /
Ueno, Takashi, 1484-49-2-502, Iidai Hachihonmatsu-cho, Higashi-Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken 739-01 / JP | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118297.4 | 21.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | JP19930291800 | 22.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29180093 | JP19940107569 | 22.04.1994 Original published format: JP 10756994 | JP19940179928 | 01.08.1994 Original published format: JP 17992894 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0654623 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0654623 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654623 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/06, // F16H61:08 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
F16H61/0437 (EP,US);
B60K17/00 (KR);
B60W10/06 (US);
B60W10/115 (US);
F16H41/00 (KR);
F16H61/08 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0096 (EP,US);
F16H59/48 (EP,US);
F16H59/74 (EP,US);
Y10S477/902 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/21] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Steuerung für Automatikgetriebe | [1995/21] | English: | Hydraulic control system for automatic transmission | [1995/21] | French: | Commande hydraulique pour transmission automatique | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 29.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0350018 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figure 1; claims 1-8 *; | [A]DE3812673 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0366003 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figure 7 *; | [A]JPH03249468 ; | [PA]EP0588627 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [PA] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0176750 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE3136725 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [D]JPH0472099 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920206), vol. 16, no. 47, Database accession no. (M - 1208), & JP03249468 A 19911107 (JAPAN ELECTRON CONTROL SYST CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |