Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0657661
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
10.07.2004 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
06.08.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |
23.07.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] |
11.06.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
14.08.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] |
29.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.12.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.05.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.03.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.11.1996 |
First examination report |
|
31.10.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.01.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] |
28.04.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] |