EP0657661 - Actuating device for a disc brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERROT BREMSEN GmbH Bärlochweg 25 68229 Mannheim / DE | [1998/40] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states PERROT BREMSEN GmbH Bärlochweg 25 D-68229 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rupprecht, Bernd Büttenweg 13 D-68535 Edingen-Neckarhausen / DE | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/24] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118324.6 | 21.11.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | DE19934339764 | 22.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4339764 | [1995/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657661 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657661 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/16 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
F16D65/18 (EP);
F16D2121/14 (EP);
F16D2125/26 (EP);
F16D2125/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/24] | Title | German: | Zuspannvorrichtung für eine Scheibenbremse | [1995/24] | English: | Actuating device for a disc brake | [1995/24] | French: | Dispositif d'actionnement d'un frein à disque | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.09.1998 | GB | 30.09.1998 | IT | 30.09.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 30.09.1998 | |
GB | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/36] | GB | 30.09.1998 | |
FR | 26.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/30] | GB | 30.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0291071 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 47; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]FR2296128 (BERGISCHE ACHSEN KOTZ SOEHNE [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 16; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2331717 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 35 - page 5, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2315037 (BERGISCHE ACHSEN KOTZ SOEHNE [DE]) |