EP0655631 - Method for manufacturing a color filter and a liquid crystal panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/22] | Color filter, method for manufacturing it, and liquid crystal panel | ||
[2001/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirota, Katsuhiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sato, Hiroshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yokoi, Hideto, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Miyazaki, Takeshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kashiwazaki, Akio, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Shiba, Shoji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/22] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | Weser, Wolfgang Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118424.4 | 23.11.1994 | [1995/22] | Priority number, date | JP19930293396 | 24.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29339693 | [1995/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655631 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0655631 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20, G02F1/1335 | [1995/22] | CPC: |
G02B5/201 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/133516 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zu Herstellung eines Farbfilters und eines Flüssigkristallschirms | [2001/45] | English: | Method for manufacturing a color filter and a liquid crystal panel | [2001/43] | French: | procédé de fabrication d'un filtre coloré et d'un écran à cristaux liquides | [2001/45] |
Former [1995/22] | Farbfilter, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Flüssigkristalltafel | ||
Former [1995/22] | Color filter, method for manufacturing it, and liquid crystal panel | ||
Former [1995/22] | Filtre coloré, procédé de fabrication et panneau à cristal liquide | Examination procedure | 30.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 25.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.09.2002 | BE | 04.09.2002 | CH | 04.09.2002 | FR | 04.09.2002 | GR | 04.09.2002 | IT | 04.09.2002 | LI | 04.09.2002 | NL | 04.09.2002 | LU | 23.11.2002 | IE | 25.11.2002 | DK | 04.12.2002 | SE | 04.12.2002 | PT | 12.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
FR | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
LU | 23.11.2002 | ||
IE | 25.11.2002 | ||
DK | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 12.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
FR | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
LU | 23.11.2002 | ||
IE | 25.11.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 12.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/34] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
FR | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
IE | 25.11.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 12.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
IE | 25.11.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 12.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
IE | 25.11.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 12.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 12.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 12.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 12.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 04.09.2002 | |
SE | 04.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 04.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS5975205 ; | [DA]JPS63235901 ; | [DA]JPH01217302 ; | [DA]JPH04123005 ; | [XA]JPH05241012 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 5,8,9,12 * the whole document * [A] 1,4,13 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840823), vol. 8, no. 183, Database accession no. (P - 296), & JP59075205 A 19840427 (SUWA SEIKOSHA) [DA] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890127), vol. 13, no. 37, Database accession no. (P - 819), & JP63235901 A 19880930 (FUJITSU) [DA] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891127), vol. 13, no. 530, Database accession no. (P - 966), & JP01217302 A 19890830 (TOSHIBA) [DA] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920814), vol. 16, no. 382, Database accession no. (P - 1403), & JP04123005 A 19920423 (TORAY) [DA] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13 * abstract * |