EP0656612 - Method and apparatus for wireless remote control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oy Helvar Purotie 3 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2000/01] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states Oy Helvar Purotie 3 SF-00380 Kauniainen / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viljanen, Teijo Kromotie 7 SF-02700 Kainiainen / FI | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Postbox 38 28 48021 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Postbox 38 28 48021 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118534.0 | 25.11.1994 | [1995/23] | Priority number, date | FI19930005419 | 03.12.1993 Original published format: FI 935419 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656612 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656612 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G08C17/00 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
H02K7/10 (EP);
G08C17/00 (EP);
G08C2201/112 (EP);
H01H2239/076 (EP);
H01H2300/03 (EP);
H02N2/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/23] | Title | German: | Drahtlosen Fernsteuerung, Verfahren und Vorrichtung | [1995/23] | English: | Method and apparatus for wireless remote control | [1995/23] | French: | Méthode et appareil de télécommande sans fil | [1995/23] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 05.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6434173 ; | [X]JPS57174950 ; | [X]US4412355 (TERBRACK WILLIAM H [US], et al); | [XY]US4471353 (CERNIK GEORGE [US]); | [A]EP0361881 (C & M TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) |