EP0655839 - Electronic system for terminating bus lines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/22] | Electronic system, semiconductor integrated circuit and termination device | ||
[2006/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [2007/01] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | ||
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states FUJITSU AUTOMATION LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taguchi, Masao, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [2005/44] |
Former [1995/22] | 01 /
Taguchi, Masao, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | ||
02 /
Higuchi, Tsuyoshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Representative(s) | Seeger, Wolfgang, et al Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | Seeger, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys., et al SEEGER & SEEGER Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118585.2 | 25.11.1994 | [1995/22] | Priority number, date | JP19930297669 | 29.11.1993 Original published format: JP 29766993 | JP19940030470 | 28.02.1994 Original published format: JP 3047094 | JP19940030501 | 28.02.1994 Original published format: JP 3050194 | [1995/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0655839 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0655839 | Date: | 27.07.1995 | [1995/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0655839 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0655839 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, G06F13/40 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
H04L25/028 (EP,US);
H03K19/00 (KR);
G11C11/40 (KR);
H03K19/00384 (EP,US);
H03K19/018571 (EP,US);
H04L25/0278 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/22] | H03K19/0175 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/22] | Title | German: | Elektronisches System zum Abschluss von Busleitungen | [2006/31] | English: | Electronic system for terminating bus lines | [2006/31] | French: | Système électronique de terminaison des lignes de bus | [2006/31] |
Former [1995/22] | Elektronisches System, Halbleiter-IC und Abschlussvorrichtung | ||
Former [1995/22] | Electronic system, semiconductor integrated circuit and termination device | ||
Former [1995/22] | Système électronique, circuit intégré semi-conducteur et dispositif de terminaison | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 23.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2006 | 30.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03025514.5 / EP1392028 | EP05009867.2 / EP1564947 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4871931 (FITZPATRICK MARK E [US], et al) [A] 60-99 * column A; figures 3,4 ** column 3, line 26 - line 53 *; | [A]EP0492613 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 10,12-19 * column A * * page 3, line 53 - line 55; figure 4 *; | [X]EP0533971 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,8,20-29,32-59 * figure . *; | [A]US5227677 (FURMAN ANATOL [US]) [A] 1-9,11,20-59 * figures 1,4 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 3 *; | [XP]US5347177 (LIPP ROBERT J [US]) [XP] 1,4-9,11,20-59 * figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 55 *; | [XPA]WO9424797 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [XP] 10 * abstract * [A] 12-19; | [X] - HANAFI ET AL., "DESIGN AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A CMOS OFF-CHIP DRIVER/RECEIVER WITH REDUCED POWER-SUPPLY DISTURBANCE", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, NEW YORK, US, (199205), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 783 - 790, XP002002101 [X] 1,8,20-29,32-39 * abstract * * page 786, column L, paragraph 2 - page 787, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.133169 | Examination | EP0420074 | EP0468583 | JPH04150731 | DE4142081 | - BARISH ET AL., "Active Terminator", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (197412), vol. 17, no. 7, page 1960 | - "Active Terminators for CMOS Drivers", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198909), vol. 32, no. 4A, pages 393 - 395, XP000039912 |