EP0657220 - Filter centrifuge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Aktiengesellschaft Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | [1999/38] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Aktiengesellschaft Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 D-80997 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feller, Johann Schönblick 6 D-83104 Tuntenhausen / DE | 02 /
Hegnauer, Bruno Römerstrasse 6a D-82131 Gauting / DE | 03 /
Knobloch, Wolfgang Diemendorferstrasse 2 D-82327 Tutzing / DE | [1995/24] | Application number, filing date | 94118804.7 | 30.11.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | DE19934342471 | 13.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4342471 | [1995/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0657220 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0657220 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657220 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B04B3/00, B04B7/02 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
B04B3/00 (EP,US);
B04B7/02 (EP,US);
B04B9/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/24] | B04B3/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [1995/24] | Title | German: | Filterzentrifuge | [1995/24] | English: | Filter centrifuge | [1995/24] | French: | Centrifugeuse filtrante | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0379452 (ROBATEL SLPI [FR]) [AD] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE3617769 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG) [A] 1 * figure . *; | [A]US3365066 (HOWELL JOHN D) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |