EP0660459 - Multiple flat terminal plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEAG Sicherheitstechnik GmbH Senator-Schwartz-Ring 26 59494 Soest / DE | [1996/27] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Gert Memelstrasse 12 D-69412 Eberbach / DE | 02 /
Schwarz, Gerhard Zollerwaldstrasse 9 D-69436 Schönbrunn / DE | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Hilgers, Hans Hubert, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Hilgers, Hans Hubert, et al Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/26] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94119099.3 | 03.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | DE19934341958 | 09.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4341958 | [1995/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0660459 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0660459 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660459 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/02, H01R13/52 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
H01R13/5205 (EP);
H01R13/04 (EP);
H01R13/502 (EP);
H01R13/5216 (EP);
H01R2107/00 (EP);
H01R24/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/26] | H01R23/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/26] | Title | German: | Vielfach-Flachstecker | [1995/26] | English: | Multiple flat terminal plug | [1995/26] | French: | Fiche à plusieurs lames plates | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR688401 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME CARLSWERK) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2663791 (TECNOFFRA) [Y] 1,2 * page 1; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE4116748 (LEOPOLD KOSTAL GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1,2 * column 1 - column 3, line 62; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5026304 (FURROW RANDY M [US]) [A] 3 * column 3, line 29 - line 43; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2132837 (BOSCH) [A] 4 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 2; figures 1-4 * |