blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0657294

EP0657294 - Automatic platen gap adjusting device for printer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2001 [2001/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [1995/24]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishi Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hori, Takashi, c/o Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
[1995/24]
Representative(s)Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al
Diehl & Partner GbR
Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/24]Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al
DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13
D-80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date94119538.009.12.1994
[1995/24]
Priority number, dateJP1993034131109.12.1993         Original published format: JP 34131193
[1995/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0657294
Date:14.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0657294
Date:30.10.1996
[1996/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0657294
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.1996
ClassificationIPC:B41J25/308
[1995/24]
CPC:
B41J25/3082 (EP,US); B41J25/308 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/24]
TitleGerman:Automatische Druckspalteinstelleinrichtung für einen Drucker[1995/24]
English:Automatic platen gap adjusting device for printer[1995/24]
French:Appareil pour régler automatiquement l'espacement entre la tête d'impression et le cylindre d'appui pour une imprimante[1995/24]
Examination procedure13.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/19]
03.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.1999Fee for grant paid
22.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPS61262161  ;
 [A]EP0170137  (METROMEDIA INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * column A *;
 [A]US4652153  (KOTSUZUMI YUZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 5, line 55 - line 65; claims 4,5 *;
 [X]EP0393759  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 18 - line 35; claim 3 *;
 [A]US5257867  (ITO NORITSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column A *;
 [PA]EP0614763  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-13* column W *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870415), vol. 11, no. 120, Database accession no. (M - 580), & JP61262161 A 19861120 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1-13 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.