EP0659958 - Carousel-type hanger for bicycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Odenwaldwerke Rittersbach GmbH Fahrzeugbau und Katastrophenschutzsysteme Oberschefflenzer Strasse 15 74834 Elztal-Rittersbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Odenwaldwerke Rittersbach GmbH Fahrzeugbau und Katastrophenschutzsysteme, Oberschefflenzer Strasse 15 74834 Elztal-Rittersbach / DE | ||
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states Odenwaldwerke Rittersbach GmbH Fahrzeugbau und Katastrophenschutzsysteme, Oberschefflenzer Strasse 15 D-74834 Elztal-Rittersbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostheimer, Tibor Stolzeneckstrasse 7 D-74821 Mosbach / DE | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Wolf-Dieter Reble & Klose Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Fischer, Wolf-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Kurfürstenstrasse 32 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94119555.4 | 10.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | DE19930019662U | 21.12.1993 Original published format: DE 9319662 U | [1995/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659958 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659958 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/00, B62H3/12 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
B62H3/12 (EP);
E04H6/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT [1995/26] | Title | German: | Karussell-Fahrradhänger | [1995/26] | English: | Carousel-type hanger for bicycles | [1995/26] | French: | Dispositif d'accrochage pour vélos du type carrousel | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.10.1997 | IT | 15.10.1997 | BE | 31.12.1997 | PT | 15.01.1998 | IE | 05.06.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 15.10.1997 | |
IT | 15.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
PT | 15.01.1998 | ||
IE | 05.06.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | IT | 15.10.1997 | |
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
PT | 15.01.1998 | ||
IE | 05.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IE | 15.10.1997 | |
IT | 15.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
PT | 15.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 15.10.1997 | |
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
PT | 15.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/49] | BE | 31.12.1997 | |
PT | 15.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | PT | 15.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE105950 (C. HAUSMANN) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4156994 (STEUER CHARLES F [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 22 - line 47 * * column 2, line 4 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9222718 (BEUKEVELD PETRUS JOHANNES [NL]) [A] 7 * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 6; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE9217562U (A. NIELSEN) [DA] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4209007 (ARNOLD GERHARD [DE]) [A] 8 * column 3, line 25 - line 52; figures 1,2 * |