blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0659009

EP0659009 - Original reading apparatus and information processing apparatus with original reading apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/25]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Iwata, Naohiro, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
02 / Yokoyama, Minoru, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
03 / Nakano, Yuji, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
04 / Terashima, Hideyuki, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
[1995/25]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/25]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date94119824.415.12.1994
[1995/25]
Priority number, dateJP1993031777117.12.1993         Original published format: JP 31777193
JP1994007863218.04.1994         Original published format: JP 7863294
[1995/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0659009
Date:21.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0659009
Date:08.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0659009
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1995
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/00, H04N1/12
[1995/45]
CPC:
H04N1/00588 (EP,US); H04N1/0057 (EP,US); H04N1/00591 (EP,US);
H04N1/00602 (EP,US); H04N1/00681 (EP,US); H04N1/00708 (EP,US);
H04N1/00734 (EP,US); H04N1/00745 (EP,US); H04N1/00753 (EP,US);
H04N1/00793 (EP,US); H04N1/04 (EP,US); H04N1/1215 (EP,US);
H04N1/125 (EP,US); H04N1/193 (EP,US); H04N2201/0416 (EP,US);
H04N2201/044 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1995/25]H04N1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/25]
TitleGerman:Vorlagelesegerät und Informationsverarbeitungsgerät mit Vorlagelesegerät[1995/25]
English:Original reading apparatus and information processing apparatus with original reading apparatus[1995/25]
French:Dispositif de lecture d'original et dispositif de traitement d'information comportant un dispositif de lecture d'original[1995/25]
Examination procedure25.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/22]
17.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.1999Fee for grant paid
27.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES15.03.2000
FR15.03.2000
IT15.03.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]ES15.03.2000
FR15.03.2000
Former [2002/26]ES15.03.2000
FR11.08.2000
Former [2001/16]FR11.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5130807  (TANABE EIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 13; figure 5 *;
 [Y]US5267058  (SATA JUNICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 11; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.