Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0958816 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2006 | B1 | EP0958816 | 15.12.1999 | A3 | EP0958816 | 24.11.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP94120045 | 17.12.1994 | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59409810D1 | 06.09.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE59409810 | 17.12.1994 | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59410429D1 | 04.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE59410429 | 17.12.1994 | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0958816T | 17.07.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP94120045 | 17.12.1994 | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5948810 | 07.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US87884397 | 19.06.1997 | US36092494 | 21.12.1994 | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6117899 | 12.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US87884397 | 19.06.1997 | US36092494 | 21.12.1994 | US28546099 | 02.04.1999 | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6284787 | 04.09.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US36092494 | 21.12.1994 | US62829500 | 28.07.2000 | US28546099 | 02.04.1999 | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07206676 | Global Dossier | 08.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0659408 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2001 | B1 | EP0659408 | 28.06.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE203669T | 15.08.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE319444T | 15.03.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2138558 | 10.02.2009 | C | CA2138558 | 22.06.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4343593 | 20.05.1998 | C2 | DE4343593 | 22.06.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0659408T | 01.10.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2159539T | 16.10.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2258302T | 16.08.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3036943T | 31.01.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1023943 | 29.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT659408E | 28.12.2001 | E | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT958816E | 30.06.2006 | E | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5693664 | 02.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4343593 | 21.12.1993 | Type | Divisional application | EP0958816 |