EP0659977 - Air motor with offset front and rear exhausts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snap-On Incorporated 2801-80th Street Kenosha Wisconsin 53141-1410 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states Snap-on Incorporated 2801-80th Street Kenosha, Wisconsin 53141-1410 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghode, Anil P. 1119 Thomas Blvd. Mundelein, Ill. 60060 / US | 02 /
Diedrich, Thomas J. 2403 Tammy Lane Racine, WI 53402 / US | 03 /
De Rome, Raymond D. 10401 - 336 Ave. Twin Lakes, WI 53181 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Wehnert, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [1995/26] | Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120147.7 | 19.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930169414 | 20.12.1993 Original published format: US 169414 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659977 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659977 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F01C13/02, F01C21/12 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
F01C21/18 (EP,US);
F01C13/02 (EP,US);
Y10S415/904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/26] | Title | German: | Vorder- und Hinter-Auslassvorrichtung für einen Druckluftmotor | [1995/26] | English: | Air motor with offset front and rear exhausts | [1995/26] | French: | Système d'evacuation avant et arrière d'air pour moteur pneumatique | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3885355 (KAKIMOTO MASAKAZU) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0141175 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4084487 (WALLACE WILLIAM K) [A] 1 * column W * |