EP0659815 - Polypropylene films suitable for packaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Opposition rejected | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Via Pergolesi 25 20125 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states BASELL NORTH AMERICA INC. 2801 Centerville Road New Castle County Delaware / US | ||
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states MONTELL NORTH AMERICA INC. 2801 Centerville Road New Castle County Delaware / US | ||
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states Himont Incorporated 2801 Centerville Road New Castle County Delaware / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgin, Emanuele 18, Via Roma I-40069 Zola Predosa, Bologna / IT | 02 /
Pasquini, Nello 16, Via Del Parco I-20064 Gorgonzola, Milan / IT | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120236.8 | 20.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | IT1993MI02670 | 20.12.1993 Original published format: IT MI932670 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659815 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659815 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/18, C08L23/02, C08L23/10, C09J7/02 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/10 (KR);
C08J7/06 (KR);
C08K3/013 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/08 (KR);
C08L23/14 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/013, C08L23/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | Für Verpackungen geeigneten polypropylen Film | [1995/26] | English: | Polypropylene films suitable for packaging | [1995/26] | French: | Pellicules de polypropylène utilisables pour l'emballage | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.2000
21.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE BP Chemicals PlasTec GmbH Martin-Adolff-Strasse 44 D-89165 Dietenheim / DE Opponent's representative Wössner, Gottfried HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | 02
07.01.2000
BOREALIS GmbH Danubiastrasse 21-25 2323 Schwechat-Mannswörth / AT Opponent's representative Wössner, Gottfried HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.2000
21.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE BP Chemicals PlasTec GmbH Martin-Adolff-Strasse 44 D-89165 Dietenheim / DE Opponent's representative Wössner, Gottfried, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
07.01.2000
Borealis AG St.-Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT Opponent's representative Wössner, Gottfried, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2000/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.2000
21.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE BP Chemicals PlasTec GmbH Martin-Adolff-Strasse 44 D-89165 Dietenheim / DE Opponent's representative Wössner, Gottfried, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | 27.04.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.10.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.11.2003 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2001 | SE | 21.12.2001 | BE | 31.12.2001 | CH | 31.12.2001 | LI | 31.12.2001 | PT | 30.06.2002 | NL | 01.07.2002 | [2003/21] |
Former [2003/16] | AT | 20.12.2001 | |
SE | 21.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 20.12.2001 | |
SE | 21.12.2001 | ||
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | SE | 21.12.2001 | |
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | SE | 21.12.2001 | |
NL | 01.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 21.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2358439 (ICI LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 6 - line 17 *; | [X]EP0206040 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 6, line 6 - page 8, line 6 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 5 *; | [X]EP0301810 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-7 * examples 3,4 *; | [A]EP0323629 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 34 - line 45 ** example 3 * |