EP0676310 - Cigarette lighter, especially for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André F-93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mallet, Christian 3 rue du Rousset F-91490 Milly-La-Foret / FR | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 94120243.4 | 14.12.1990 | [1995/41] | Priority number, date | FR19890016702 | 18.12.1989 Original published format: FR 8916702 | [1995/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0676310 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0676310 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0676310 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60N3/14, F23Q7/00 | [1995/41] | CPC: |
B60N3/14 (EP);
B60Q3/275 (EP);
B60Q3/64 (EP);
F23Q7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1995/41] | Title | German: | Zigarettenanzünder, vorzugsweise für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1995/41] | English: | Cigarette lighter, especially for motor vehicles | [1995/41] | French: | Allume-cigares, notamment pour véhicules automobiles | [1998/12] |
Former [1995/41] | Allume-cigare, notamment pour véhicules automobiles | Examination procedure | 04.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90403590.4 / EP0434519 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 18.03.1998 | [1999/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0200247 (PRAMAGGIORE, LUIGI) [A] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE1632593 (AMERICAN MACHINE & FOUNRDY CO.) [A] 1 * page 4, line 16 - page 6, line 8; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2444587 (PRAMAGGIORE LUIGI); | [A]FR2272343 (SCHOELLER & CO. ELEKTROTECHNISCHE FABRIK); | [A]DE2824657 (SQUIRREL S.P.A.); | [A]DE3237995 (KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO); | [AD]US4500774 (KAZUMI HONJO) |