EP0664984 - Sequential drawer slide or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum Gesellschaft m.b.H. Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [2000/12] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states Julius Blum Gesellschaft m.b.H. Industriestrasse 1 A-6973 Höchst / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röck, Erich Küferstrasse 7 A-6973 Höchst / AT | 02 /
Gasser, Ingo Waldstrasse 47b A-6973 Höchst / AT | [1995/31] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 94120260.8 | 21.12.1994 | [1995/31] | Priority number, date | AT19940000075 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: AT 7594 | [1995/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0664984 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0664984 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664984 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/10 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
A47B88/493 (EP,US);
A47B88/467 (EP,US);
A47B2210/007 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0072 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0083 (EP,US);
A47B2210/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/31] | Title | German: | Differentialauszug für Schubladen | [1995/31] | English: | Sequential drawer slide or the like | [1995/31] | French: | Coulisse de tiroir séquentielle ou similaire | [1995/31] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.12.2000 | [2003/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4019124 (GRASS AG [AT]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [E]EP0635226 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [E] 1,7-13 * the whole document * |