EP0659998 - Ignition apparatus for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | For all designated states HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 2477-3, Kashimayazu, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
For all designated states HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 2477-3, Kashimayazu, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oishi, Hidetoshi Bouda Apartment 234, 2593, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | 02 /
Sugiura, Noboru 1360-27, Kasahara-cho Mito-shi, Ibaraki 310 / JP | 03 /
Katagishi, Kenichi 1418-306, Tabiko Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/26] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120264.0 | 21.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | JP19930331048 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33104893 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0659998 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0659998 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F02P3/055, F02P3/02, H01F38/12, F02P3/04, H01L23/373 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
F02P3/0552 (EP,US);
H01F30/00 (KR);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/13091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/26] | F02P3/055, F02P3/02, H01F38/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1995/26] | Title | German: | Zündapparat für eine innere Brennkraftmaschine | [1995/26] | English: | Ignition apparatus for internal combustion engine | [1995/26] | French: | Dispositif d'allumage pour un moteur à combustion interne | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/10] | 20.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/10] | Request for further processing for: | 31.07.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 31.07.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.11.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH0330440 ; | [A]US5182628 (IZAWA KATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 19; figures 1,3-5 *; | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 15, no. 159, Database accession no. (E - 1059), & JP330440 A 00000000 [DA] * abstract * | [A] - NGON BINH NGUYEN, "USING ADVANCED SUBSTRATE MATERIALS WITH HYBRID PACKAGING TECHNIQUES FOR ULTRAHIGH-POWER ICS", SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, (19930201), vol. 36, no. 2, page 59, 60, 62, XP000343999 [A] 1 * page 60, column R - page 62; figures 2-4 * |