EP0665251 - Halogen-free, flame-retardant polyurethane rigid foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1997/51] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Staendeke, Horst, Dr. Alte Honrather Strasse 22 D-53797 Lohmar / DE | [1995/31] | Application number, filing date | 94120368.9 | 22.12.1994 | [1995/31] | Priority number, date | DE19944402691 | 29.01.1994 Original published format: DE 4402691 | [1995/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0665251 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0665251 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08K5/52, C08K5/00 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
C08K5/52 (EP);
C08K5/53 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/52, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08K5/53, C08L75/04 (EP) |
Former IPC [1995/31] | C08G18/48, C08K5/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/31] | Title | German: | Halogenfreier, flammwidriger Polyurethanhartschaum | [1995/31] | English: | Halogen-free, flame-retardant polyurethane rigid foam | [1995/31] | French: | Mousse rigide de polyuréthane ignufuge et sans halogène | [1995/31] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0188650 (B.F. GOODRICH) [X] 1 * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 4 * * page 14, line 16 - page 15, line 12 * * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 9; claims 1,3-5 *; | [A]EP0422797 (ICI) [A] 1 * page 2, line 17 - line 37; claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9106599 (GENERAL ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 9 * * page 21, line 20 - page 24, line 12; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US5256714 (LIU ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 27; claims 1,5 *; | [A]EP0078478 (BAYER) [A] 1 * page 5, line 4 - page 13, line 30; claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0394769 (HÜTZEN) |