EP0661042 - Cosmetic composition containing an organofluorinated silicone resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 7-5-5, Ginza, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 7-5-5, Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-10 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Masashi, c/o Shiseido Research Center 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | 02 /
Nanba, Tomiyuki, c/o Shiseido Research Center 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | 03 /
Uehara, Keiichi, c/o Shiseido Research Center 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | 04 /
Sakurai, Osamu, c/o Shiseido Research Center 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | 05 /
Takahashi, Hideki, c/o Shiseido Research Center 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | 06 /
Fukui, Hiroshi, c/o Shiseido Research Center 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120426.5 | 22.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | JP19930353169 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 35316993 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0661042 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/897 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/27] | Title | German: | Organofluorsilikonharz enthaltende kosmetische Zusammensetzung | [1995/27] | English: | Cosmetic composition containing an organofluorinated silicone resin | [1995/27] | French: | Composition cosmétique contenant une résine silicone organofluorée | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |