EP0659847 - Anti-fouling compositions and fouling control of harmful aquatic organisms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd. 1-22, Kamiya-cho 2-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd. 1-22, Kamiya-cho 2-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | |||
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd. 1-22, Kamiya-cho 2-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuboi, Makoto 18-30, Funairiminami 3-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Yuki, Shuhei 17-11-403, Suzugamine-cho, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Kakimizu, Akiko 15-1-401, Takamatsu-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Arai, Kenji 2-11-7-201, Sonehigashino-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Mizutani, Masato 5-3, Higashiyamadai 3-chome Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120598.1 | 23.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | JP19930333791 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33379193 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659847 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659847 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/14, A01N43/80, C08K5/47 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/1625 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | Anwuchsverhindernde Zusammensetzung und Kontrolle der Verschmutzung durch schädliche, im Wasser lebende Organismen | [1998/12] | English: | Anti-fouling compositions and fouling control of harmful aquatic organisms | [1995/26] | French: | Compositions anti-selissures et contrôle de l'encrassement par les organismes aquatiques muisibles | [1995/26] |
Former [1995/26] | Anwuchsverhindernde Zusammensetzungen und Kontrolle der Verschmutzung durch schädliche Unterwasserorganismen | Examination procedure | 19.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 15.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4127687 (DUPONT JOHN A) [DA] 1 * claims 1,13 * * examples 42,79 *; | [A]EP0490565 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [PA]GB2277742 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1 * claim 1 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 10 * |