EP0662384 - Extrusion die, method of forming molding on platelike article and platelike article with molding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube City Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | For all designated states TOKAI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 1, Nagane-cho 4-chome Obu City Aichi Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube City Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | ||
For all designated states TOKAI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 1, Nagane-cho 4-chome Obu City, Aichi Prefecture / JP | |||
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube-city Yamaguchi-pref. / JP | ||
For all designated states TOKAI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 1, Nagane-cho 4-chome Obu City, Aichi Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Tosikazi, c/o Tokai Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha No. 1 Nagane-cho 4-chome Obu City, Aichi Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Yamauchi, Yutaka, c/o Research Institue for Indus. Technology of Central Glass Comp., Ltd., No. 1510 Oguchi-cho, Matsusaka City, Mie Pref. / JP | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/28] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan B.Sc.(Phys.) Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120627.8 | 23.12.1994 | [1995/28] | Priority number, date | JP19930328411 | 24.12.1993 Original published format: JP 32841193 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662384 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662384 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/02 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
C03C27/048 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/155 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
B60J10/70 (EP,US);
B29C2948/926 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | Strangpressdüse, Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Formlings auf einen plattenförmigen Gegenstand und plattenförmiger Gegenstand mit hergestelltem Formling | [1995/28] | English: | Extrusion die, method of forming molding on platelike article and platelike article with molding | [1995/28] | French: | Filière d'extrusion, méthode de moulage sur un article en forme de plaque, et article avec pièce moulée | [1995/28] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.09.1999 | BE | 01.09.1999 | IT | 01.09.1999 | NL | 01.09.1999 | SE | 01.09.1999 | PT | 02.12.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 01.09.1999 | |
BE | 01.09.1999 | ||
NL | 01.09.1999 | ||
SE | 01.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 01.09.1999 | |
BE | 01.09.1999 | ||
SE | 01.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 01.09.1999 | |
BE | 01.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 01.09.1999 | |
BE | 01.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0281618 ; | [A]JPS57176143 ; | [Y]US3957406 (BATTERSBY WILLIAM R) [Y] 1-22 * column A * * figure - * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 32 *; | [DA]US5108526 (CORNILS GERD [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0493068 (TOKAI KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [DY] 1-22 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 13 * * column 8, line 46 - line 57 * * figure -; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900614), vol. 14, no. 276, Database accession no. (M - 0984), & JP02081618 A 19900322 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 13 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 49, Database accession no. 82-05613J, & JPS57176143 A 19821029 (IDEMITSU KOSAN K.K.) [A] 13 * abstract * |