EP0661162 - Substrate for ink-jet head, ink-jet head, and ink-jet apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriyama, Jiro, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Sugama, Sadayuki, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 03 /
Hirabayashi, Hiromitsu, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 04 /
Tajika, Hiroshi, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 05 /
Koitabashi, Noribumi, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 06 /
Akiyama, Yuji, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 07 /
Imanaka, Yoshiyuki, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 08 /
Izumida, Masaaki, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120734.2 | 27.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | JP19930336704 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33670493 | JP19940324402 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: JP 32440294 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0661162 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0661162 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661162 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/05, B41J2/195, B41J2/14 | [1996/21] | CPC: |
B41J2/04563 (EP,US);
B41J2/04566 (EP,US);
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/14153 (EP,US);
B41J2/16579 (EP,US);
B41J2/195 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/27] | B41J2/195, B41J2/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | Substrat für einen Tintenstrahlkopf, Tintenstrahlkopf und Tintenstrahlgerät | [1995/27] | English: | Substrate for ink-jet head, ink-jet head, and ink-jet apparatus | [1995/27] | French: | Couche de base pour une tête à jet d'encre, tête et dispositif à jet d'encre | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2000 | BE | 12.07.2000 | CH | 12.07.2000 | ES | 12.07.2000 | GR | 12.07.2000 | LI | 12.07.2000 | NL | 12.07.2000 | DK | 12.10.2000 | PT | 12.10.2000 | SE | 12.10.2000 | IE | 27.12.2000 | LU | 27.12.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
BE | 12.07.2000 | ||
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
ES | 12.07.2000 | ||
GR | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
NL | 12.07.2000 | ||
DK | 12.10.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
BE | 12.07.2000 | ||
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
ES | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
NL | 12.07.2000 | ||
DK | 12.10.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
BE | 12.07.2000 | ||
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
ES | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
NL | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
BE | 12.07.2000 | ||
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
ES | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
BE | 12.07.2000 | ||
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
BE | 12.07.2000 | ||
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
BE | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
BE | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 12.07.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62156963 ; | [A]US4947194 (KYOSHIMA MASAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,11,12 * column 5, line 17 - line 26; figure 5; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0444861 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,11,12 * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 50; figure 1B *; | [A]DE4203294 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,9,11,12 * page 4, line 24 - line 40; figure 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871218), vol. 11, no. 388, Database accession no. (M - 652)<2835>, & JP62156963 A 19870711 (CANON INC) [A] 1,9,11 * abstract * |