EP0661762 - Multifilamentary oxide superconducting wire and coil formed by the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Revocation of patent | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN 1-8, Honmachi 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | ||
For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN 1-8, Honmachi 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohkura, Kengo c/o Osaka Works of Sumimoto El. Ind., Ltd. 1-1-3, Shimaya Konohana-ku Osaka / JP | 02 /
Sato, Kenichi c/o Osaka Works of Sumimoto El. Ind., Ltd. 1-1-3, Shimaya Konohana-ku Osaka / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120753.2 | 27.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | JP19930336853 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33685393 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661762 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661762 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/14 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
H10N60/203 (EP,US);
Y10S505/704 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | Multifilamentäre Oxyd-supraleitende Drähte und Spule mit diesem Draht | [1995/27] | English: | Multifilamentary oxide superconducting wire and coil formed by the same | [1995/27] | French: | Fil d'oxyde supraconducteur multibrins et bobine fabriquée en utilisant ce fil | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1997
20.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1997
20.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1997
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 29.01.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.06.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.04.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/36] | Appeal following opposition | 13.04.2004 | Appeal received No. T0507/04 | 14.06.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.04.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 25.04.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.12.2000 | CH | 31.12.2000 | LI | 31.12.2000 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/05] | SE | 28.12.2000 | |
CH | 31.12.2000 | ||
LI | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/15] | SE | 28.12.2000 | |
CH | 31.12.2000 | ||
LI | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 28.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0467237 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]EP0504895 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) |