blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0661428

EP0661428 - Gas fuel supply mechanism for gas combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2001 [2001/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/27]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oshima, Yoshikazu
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Nishida, Toshiyuki
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Kato, Atsushi
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
04 / Ueda, Kazuhiro
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
05 / Ikeo, Mitsuru
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
06 / Nakamura, Katsunori
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
07 / Noseyama, Ryuichi
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
08 / Ishibashi, Kenichiro
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
09 / Aoki, Shigeru
c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
[1995/27]
Representative(s)Huber, Bernhard, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Kopernikusstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/30]Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm, Kopernikusstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
Former [1995/27]Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm, Kopernikusstrasse 9
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date94120842.328.12.1994
[1995/27]
Priority number, dateJP1993035188828.12.1993         Original published format: JP 35188893
JP1993035188928.12.1993         Original published format: JP 35188993
JP1993035189028.12.1993         Original published format: JP 35189093
JP1993035189128.12.1993         Original published format: JP 35189193
[1995/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0661428
Date:05.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0661428
Date:08.05.1996
[1996/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0661428
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.1996
ClassificationIPC:F02D19/02
[1995/27]
CPC:
F02D19/024 (EP,US); F02D19/022 (EP,US); F02D19/025 (EP,US);
F02D19/027 (EP,US); F02M21/0224 (EP,US); F02M21/029 (EP,US);
F02M21/06 (EP,US); F02B1/04 (EP,US); F02D2200/503 (EP,US);
F02M21/0215 (EP,US); F02M21/0239 (EP,US); F02M21/0242 (EP,US);
F02M21/0278 (EP,US); Y02T10/30 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/27]
TitleGerman:Gaszufuhrmechanismus für Gasbrennkraftmaschine[1995/27]
English:Gas fuel supply mechanism for gas combustion engine[1995/27]
French:Méchanisme d'admission de carburant gazeux pour moteur à combustion à gaz[1995/27]
Examination procedure14.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/33]
13.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.1999Fee for grant paid
17.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99112594.9  / EP0942161
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPS59108855  ;
 [X]US2902988  (FRANK RIPPINGILLE) [X] 1 * column 2, line 27 - line 32; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2908143  (PRICE GEORGE A) [X] 1 * column 1, line 43 - line 60; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB1332024  (LNG SERVICES INC) [A] 2 * page 2, line 52 - line 68 * * page 2, line 90 - line 97 * * page 3, line 29 - line 59; figures 1,3,4 *;
 [A]US4421280  (LEWIS DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 11,12,14,17 * column A * * column 1, line 53 - line 57 * * column 2, line 19 - line 22 * * column 3, line 5 - line 23 * * column 3, line 45 - line 54 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 33 * * column 5, line 39 - line 58 * * column 6, line 30 - line 51 *;
 [X]CA1185852  (MORGAN DONALD B) [X] 1 * page 7, line 4 - line 11 * * page 7, line 21 - line 23; figure 3 *;
 [XA]US4537172  (KANEHARA KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 10 * column A * * column 1, line 30 - line 42 * * column 2, line 27 - line 45 * * column 3, line 1 - line 5 * * column 3, line 23 - line 26 * * column 4, line 44 - line 60 * * column 5, line 6 - line 12 * * column 7, line 47 - line 55 * * column 8, line 21 - line 32 * [A] 3;
 [A]US4811720  (KATUMATA SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 2 * column 2, line 39 - line 52; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]EP0420599  (CANADIAN GAS ASS [CA]) [X] 10,11,13,15 * page 5, line 19 - line 29 * * page 5, line 35 - line 36 * * page 8, line 26 - line 32 * * page 8, line 43 - line 46 * * page 10, line 11 - line 21 * * page 10, line 26 - line 40 ** page 10, line 49 - page 11, line 4 *;
 [XA]US5150685  (PORTER FRED C [US], et al) [X] 10 * column A * * column 2, line 6 - line 37 * * column 2, line 47 - line 56 * * column 3, line 17 - line 43 * * column 4, line 17 - line 34 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 20 * * column 7, line 21 - line 37 * * column 8, line 16 - line 28 * * column 8, line 45 - column 9, line 27 * [A] 3;
 [PX]EP0581391  (DELTEC FUEL SYSTEMS BV [NL]) [PX] 10,11 * column 1, line 1 - line 7 * * column 2, line 14 - line 24 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 8 *;
 [PA]US5314007  (CHRISTENSON GARY M [US]) [PA] 1,2 * column 2, line 11 - line 31 * * column 3, line 1 - line 12; figure 1 *;
 [XA]  - "Electronic Control of a Fuel-Injected Natural Gas Engine", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH GB, (19921201), vol. 344, page 987, XP000327218 [X] 10-12 [A] 3-5
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841018), vol. 8, no. 227, Database accession no. (M - 332)<1664>, & JP59108855 A 19840623 (NOHON) [X] 10,11 * abstract * [A] 3-5
ExaminationUS4704997
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.