EP0595792 - Method and apparatus for driving capacitive display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inada, Shuji 31-304, Higashikidera-cho 1-chome Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohba, Toshihiro 182-7, Kodono-cho Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Ogawa, Ikuo 2007 S.E.158th Avenue Vancouver Washington 968 / US | 04 /
Kishishita, Hiroshi 12-5, Jungu 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Uede, Hisashi 37, Honmachi 2-chome Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP | [1994/29] |
Former [1994/18] | 01 /
Inada, Shuji 31-304, Higashikidera-cho 1-chome Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ohba, Toshihiro 182-7, Kodono-cho Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ogawa, Ikuo 50-501, 1-2, Ukyo 2-chome Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kishishita, Hiroshi 12-5, Jungu 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Uede, Hisashi 37, Honmachi 2-chome Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94200046.4 | 09.12.1988 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | JP19880139638 | 07.06.1988 Original published format: JP 13963888 | JP19880165561 | 02.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16556188 | JP19880179997 | 18.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17999788 | JP19880179998 | 18.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17999888 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0595792 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0595792 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595792 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/30, G09G3/36, H04N3/12 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
H04N3/127 (EP,US);
G09G3/2014 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (EP,US);
H04N3/14 (EP,US);
G09G2310/027 (EP,US);
G09G2310/066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Steuern eines kapazitiven Anzeigegeräts | [1994/18] | English: | Method and apparatus for driving capacitive display device | [1994/18] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la commande d'un appareil d'affichage capacitif | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88311705.3 / EP0345399 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4554539 (GRAVES STEVEN P [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]FR2547091 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - 1984 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM; DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, NY, US, PALISADES INSTITUTE FOR RESEARCH SERVICES, (198406) [A] 1-3 * T. Gielow et al. : "Multiplex drive of a Thin-Film EL Panel", pages 242 - 244 * * page 242, column 1, line 34 - page 242, column 1, line 53; figure 4 * |