EP0610993 - Apparatus for receiving excrements and urine of domestic cats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van den Bos, Ferdinand Joost Da Costakade 81 I NL-1053 WH Amsterdam / NL | [1994/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Metman, Karel Johannes Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O.Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 94200237.9 | 08.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | NL19930000249 | 09.02.1993 Original published format: NL 9300249 | [1994/33] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610993 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610993 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
A01K1/0114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme von Katzenexkrementen und -urin | [1996/21] | English: | Apparatus for receiving excrements and urine of domestic cats | [1994/33] | French: | Dispositif pour recueillir les excréments et l'urine de chats domestiques | [1994/33] |
Former [1994/33] | Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme von Katzenekskrementen und -urin | Examination procedure | 22.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.1996 | CH | 22.05.1996 | ES | 22.05.1996 | LI | 22.05.1996 | SE | 22.08.1996 | [2002/26] |
Former [1997/29] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 22.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4522150 (GERSHMAN LEONARD [US]) [X] 1 * column W *; | [A]US4846104 (PIERSON JR HARRY G [US]) |