Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0613239
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.09.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
11.09.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] |
19.08.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.07.1998 |
Change - name/address |
published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] |
23.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.12.1997 |
First examination report |
|
16.12.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.03.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.03.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] |
15.07.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] |