Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5473282 | 05.12.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP93200491 | 22.02.1993 | US19824094 | 18.02.1994 | US37104495 | 10.01.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06291577 | Global Dossier | 18.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP93200491 | 22.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0613239 | Global Dossier | 28.10.1998 | B1 | EP0613239 | 31.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP93200491 | 22.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69414152T | 20.05.1999 | T2 | DE69414152D1 | 03.12.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP93200491 | 22.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100331369B | 17.08.2002 | B1 | KR940020667 | 16.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP93200491 | 22.02.1993 |