EP0612503 - Universally applicable cell collecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Futura Nova B.V. Olympiaplein 39 NL-1077 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1994/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanden Berghe, Dirk André Heirweg 154 B-9270 Laarne / BE | 02 /
Rovers, Willem Pieter Gerard Lekstraat 10 NL-5347 KV Oss / NL | 03 /
Kist, Joost Olympiaplein 39 NL-1077 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus, et al Octrooibureau Los & Stigter P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Van Breda, Jacobus, et al Octrooibureau Los & Stigter, P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1994/35] | Metman, Karel Johannes Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O.Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 94200461.5 | 23.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | NL19930000354 | 25.02.1993 Original published format: NL 9300354 | [1994/35] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612503 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
A61B10/02 (EP,US);
C12M33/02 (KR);
A61B10/0291 (EP,US);
C12M23/02 (KR);
A61B2010/0216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | Allgemein anwendbare Vorrichtung zur Zellgewinnung | [1994/35] | English: | Universally applicable cell collecting device | [1994/35] | French: | Dispositif universellement applicable destiné à collecter des cellules | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 23.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/44] | 11.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2739585 (ERNEST AYRE JAMES) [X] 1-3,6,13 * column 2, line 41 - line 44; figures 2,3 * [A] 5,8; | [X]US4232673 (BUCALO LOUIS) [X] 1 * column 10, line 58 - line 65; figure 14 *; | [A]EP0228752 (FUTURA NOVA BV [NL]) [A] 1,4,9,10,12 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0262966 (ANIMAL HOUSE INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 1, line 39 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]US4981143 (SAKITA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,9 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 3; figures 11,12 * |