EP0615887 - Supplemental inflatable restraint system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 700 East Firmin Street Kokomo Indiana 46902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states DELCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 700 East Firmin Street Kokomo Indiana 46902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ravas, Richard Joseph, Jr. 4800 Pavalion Drive Kokomo, Indiana 46902 / US | 02 /
Gose, Mark Wendell 722 South 400 East Kokomo, Indiana 46902 / US | 03 /
Kincaid, Kevin Dale 1401 Ruhl Garden Court Kokomo, Indiana 46902 / US | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | ||
Former [1994/38] | Jehan, Robert Patent Section, 1st Floor, Gideon House, 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94200466.4 | 24.02.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | US19930033736 | 18.03.1993 Original published format: US 33736 | [1994/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615887 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/00 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
B60R21/017 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | Ergänzende, aufblasbare Rückhaltevorrichtung | [1994/38] | English: | Supplemental inflatable restraint system | [1994/38] | French: | Système de retenue gonflable supplémentaire | [1994/38] | File destroyed: | 13.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/49] | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9002062 (BOSCH) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 5, line 8; figures 1,5 *; | [Y]WO9002672 (BOSCH) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 24 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [X]WO8904779 (BOSCH) [X] 2,3 * page 3, line 9 - page 6, line 23; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0344788 (NIPPONDENSO) [A] 1 * column 5, line 17 - column 7, line 45; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US5046149 (DOUGLAS A. NUNAN) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5155376 (MASAMI OKANO) [A] 1 * column W * |