Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0614928 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2000 | B1 | EP0614928 | 06.09.1995 | A3 | EP0614928 | 14.09.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP94200610 | 09.03.1994 | EP93200737 | 12.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06322105 | Global Dossier | 22.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP93200737 | 12.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2118755 | 13.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP93200737 | 12.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69422840T | 27.07.2000 | T2 | DE69422840D1 | 09.03.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP93200737 | 12.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5420236 | 30.05.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP93200737 | 12.03.1993 |