EP0621091 - A method of forming a tubular member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shah, Sanjay Mahasukhlal 221 Parsons Lane Rochester Hills, Michigan 48307 / US | 02 /
Lovell, Michael Harry 260 Lena Hill Drive Leonard, Michigan 48367 / US | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/10] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/43] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94200743.6 | 22.03.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | US19930047418 | 19.04.1993 Original published format: US 47418 | US19930048016 | 19.04.1993 Original published format: US 48016 | [1994/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621091 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621091 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B21D26/02 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
B21D26/033 (EP);
B60G2206/012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Formen eines rohrförmigen Elementes | [1994/43] | English: | A method of forming a tubular member | [1994/43] | French: | Procédé pour former un élément tubulaire | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 28.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1998
ADMISSIBLE Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft FTP/S, C106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/19] | 20.04.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.08.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.07.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 30.07.1999 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0195157 (STANDARD TUBE CANADA) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-6; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US5070717 (BOYD) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-8; claims 1,4 *; | [A]US4829803 (CUDINI) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-5; claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]GB2244228 (BENTELER) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,4,7; claims 1,2 * |