EP0622052 - Method for manufacturing a membrane for controlled bone regeneration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEKA N.V. Noorderlaan 79 - bus 1 B-2030 Antwerpen / BE | [1994/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Buck, Vincent Beeldstraat 30 B-9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 94201125.5 | 23.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | BE19930000425 | 28.04.1993 Original published format: BE 9300425 | [1994/44] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622052 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622052 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61C13/00, A61F2/28 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
A61C8/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2/2803 (EP);
A61F2/2846 (EP);
A61F2/30942 (EP);
A61B17/86 (EP);
A61C13/0013 (EP);
A61F2/3094 (EP);
A61F2002/285 (EP);
A61F2002/30948 (EP);
A61F2002/30957 (EP);
A61F2002/30962 (EP);
A61F2310/00023 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Membrane für eine kontrollierte Knochenregeneration | [1994/44] | English: | Method for manufacturing a membrane for controlled bone regeneration | [1994/44] | French: | Méthode pour la fabrication d'une membrane destiné à la régénération de l'os contrôlé | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0097001 (CONTOUR MED PARTNERS) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9208175 (CLYNCH) [A] 1,2,4,6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0348061 (IMPERIAL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4684370 (BARETT) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9114404 (JOHANSSON) [A] 1 * the whole document * |