EP0687573 - Dye donor element for use in a thermal dye transfer method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanmaele, Luc c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., DIE 3800 Septestraat 27, B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [1995/51] | Application number, filing date | 94201683.3 | 13.06.1994 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687573 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/38, C09B55/00, C09B23/00, C09B23/02, C09B23/04 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
B41M5/39 (EP,US);
C09B23/0091 (EP,US);
C09B23/02 (EP,US);
C09B23/04 (EP,US);
C09B55/009 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP);
Y10S428/914 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/51] | Title | German: | Farbstoffdonorelement zur Anwendung in einem thermischen Farbstoffübertragungsverfahren | [1995/51] | English: | Dye donor element for use in a thermal dye transfer method | [1995/51] | French: | Elément donneur de colorant pour utilisation dans un procédé de transfert thermique de colorant | [1995/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 04.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.04.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5262289 (OHYA KAZUKO [JP], et al) [X] 6,9,7 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 22 * * column 7, dye 21 - column 8, dye 24 * * column 10, dye 38 *; | [A]EP0436736 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]US5084571 (SHIMADA YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,5,8 * column 1, line 48 - column 5, line 3 * * column 18, line 54 - line 62 *; | [A]DE1192665 (AGFA AG) [A] 8 * column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 43 * |