blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0630557

EP0630557 - A construction for automatically milking animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
[1997/45]
Former [1994/52]For all designated states
Texas Industries Inc.
15 Pietermaai
Willemstad, Curaçao / AN
Inventor(s)01 / van der Lely, Cornelis
7, Brüschenrain
CH-6300 Zug / CH
[1994/52]
Representative(s)Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Former [1997/45]Mulder, Herman, et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Former [1994/52]Mulder, Herman
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL
Application number, filing date94201789.822.06.1994
[1994/52]
Priority number, dateNL1993000109924.06.1993         Original published format: NL 9301099
[1994/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0630557
Date:28.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0630557
Date:15.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0630557
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1995
ClassificationIPC:A01J7/00
[1994/52]
CPC:
A01J7/04 (EP); A01J5/0075 (EP); A01J5/0175 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1994/52]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum automatischen Melken von Tieren[1994/52]
English:A construction for automatically milking animals[1994/52]
French:Dispositif de traite automatique d'animaux[1994/52]
Examination procedure04.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/44]
17.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1999Fee for grant paid
29.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03076260.3  / EP1342407
EP99202283.0  / EP0951820
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2218888  (HANAUER) [X] 1,25 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 17, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-6; claims 1,9,37 *;
 [A]EP0091892  (ALFA-LAVAL) [A] 1,25 * page 4, line 33 - page 6, line 18 * * figure 1; claims 1-4,7 *;
 [A]EP0270165  (MULTINORM BV) [A] 1,25 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 10 * * column 8, line 30 - line 43 * * figures 1,9,11,12; claims 1,5 *;
 [A]EP0440313  (MULTINORM BV) [A] 1,25 * column 9, line 37 - line 42 * * column 10, line 34 - column 11, line 18 * * figure 13; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.