EP0633611 - Semiconductor device comprising an insulated-gate bipolar field-effect device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/02] | Insulated gate bipolar transistor | ||
[1998/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
IT
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [1998/45] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1995/02] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amaratunga, Gehan Anil, c/o Univ. of Cambridge Department of Engineering, Trumpington Street Cambridge CB2 1PZ / GB | 02 /
Udrea, Florin, c/o University of Cambridge Department of Engineering, Trumpington Street Cambridge CB2 1PZ / GB | [1995/02] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Brian Thomas, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [1995/10] |
Former [1995/02] | Clark, Jane Anne Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94201890.4 | 30.06.1994 | [1995/02] | Priority number, date | GB19930013843 | 05.07.1993 Original published format: GB 9313843 | [1995/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633611 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0633611 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/739, H01L29/745 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
H01L29/7455 (EP,US);
H01L29/1095 (EP,US);
H01L29/7395 (EP,US);
H01L29/7397 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/02] | H01L29/72, H01L29/74 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/02] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung mit einer Bipolarfeldeffektanordnung mit isoliertem Gate | [1998/45] | English: | Semiconductor device comprising an insulated-gate bipolar field-effect device | [1998/45] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur comprenant un dispositif bipolaire à effet de champ à grille isolée | [1998/45] |
Former [1995/02] | Bipolartransistor mit isoliertem Gate | ||
Former [1995/02] | Insulated gate bipolar transistor | ||
Former [1995/02] | Transistor bipôlaire à grille isolée | Examination procedure | 11.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 23.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 04.11.1998 | [2003/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0098497 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5151762 (UENISHI AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,6,7 * column W *; | [A]EP0480356 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]US5016076 (DARWISH MOHAMED N [US]) [A] 1,2,5 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2422258 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR]) [A] 1,2,6 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0043009 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4282478 (LEIDICH ARTHUR J) [A] 9 * column A * |