EP0635710 - Method and apparatus for surface area liquid transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Clinical Diagnostics, Inc. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester New York 14650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Clinical Diagnostics, Inc. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states CLINICAL DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS, INC. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobs, Merrit N., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1995/04] | Phillips, Margaret Dawn Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 94202115.5 | 19.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | US19930094724 | 21.07.1993 Original published format: US 94724 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0635710 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0635710 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, G01N1/28, B01L3/02 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
B01L3/02 (EP,US);
B01L3/0255 (EP,US);
G01N35/00029 (EP,US);
B01L2300/069 (EP,US);
B01L2400/025 (EP,US);
B01L3/0244 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/04] | G01N1/28, B01L3/02, G01N35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Übertragen von Flüssigkeiten auf einer Oberfläche | [1995/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for surface area liquid transfer | [1995/04] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour le transfert de liquides sur une surface | [1995/04] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/28] | 13.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2095404 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8,9; | [Y]EP0376110 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0075605 (STOCKER WINFRIED DR MED) [Y] 1 * page 12, line 5 - line 11 * * page 13, line 6 - line 20 * * figure 3, item 3 001c *; | [A]WO9101364 (IMP CANCER RES TECH [GB]) [A] 1,3,6 * page 3, line 12 - page 6, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0459093 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 7, line 42 - line 52 * * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3341518 (BIOTEST SERUM INSTITUT GMBH) [A] 3-5 * figures 1,5 *; | [AD]US5143849 (BARRY JAMES V [US], et al) |