EP0644201 - Derivatives of gpl60 and vaccines based on gpl60 or a derivative thereof, containing an adjuvant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Biologicals S.A. 89 rue de l'Institut 1330 Rixensart / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS s.a. 89 rue de l'Institut B-1330 Rixensart / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Wijendale, Frans Teckerstraat 12 B-3040 Ottenburg / BE | 02 /
Slaoui, Moncef, SmithKline Beecham Biologicals s.a., 89 rue de l'Institut B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 03 /
Bruck, Claudine, SmithKline Beecham Biologicals s.a., 89 rue de l'Institute B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 04 /
Francotte, Myriam, SmithKline Beecham Biologicals s.a., 89 rue de l'Institute B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 05 /
Kummert, Suzy, SmithKline Beecham Biologicals s.a., 89 rue de l'Institute B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 94202409.2 | 21.09.1991 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | GB19900021175 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: GB 9021175 | GB19910006048 | 21.03.1991 Original published format: GB 9106048 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644201 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/16, C12N15/49, A61K39/39, A61K39/21 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR);
C12N2740/16122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | GP160 Derivate und Adjuvans enthaltende Impfstoffe auf Basis von GP160 oder dessen Derivate | [1995/12] | English: | Derivatives of gpl60 and vaccines based on gpl60 or a derivative thereof, containing an adjuvant | [1995/12] | French: | Dérivés de gp160 et vaccines à base de gp160 ou d'un de ses dérivés, contenant un adjuvant | [1995/12] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/11] | 27.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91916067.1 / EP0550485 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0335635 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [Y] 2-6 * the whole document *; | [XY] - S.L.HU ET AL, "Immunisation with HIV-1 gp160 enhances HIV-specific immune responses elicited by vaccinia-HIV recombinant virus", INT.CONF.AIDS, 20-23 JUNE 1990 [X] 1,7-12 * see abstract Th.A.343 * [Y] 2-6 | [Y] - M.P.KIENY ET AL, "Improved antigenicity of the HIV env protein by cleavage site removal", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, OXFORD, (198809), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 219 - 225, XP000000860 [Y] 2-6 * the whole document * | [Y] - P.L.EARL ET AL, "Oligomeric structure of the human immunodeficiency virus type 1 envelop glycoprotein", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (199001), vol. 87, pages 648 - 652 [Y] 5,6 * the whole document * | [A] - K.N.MASIHI ET AL, "Exacerbation of human immunodeficiency virus infection in promonocytic cells by bacterial immunomodulators", J.AIDS, NEW YORK, (1990), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 200 - 205, XP009149021 [A] 1-12 * see pages 200-201; page 203, column 1; page 204, column 2 - page 205; figure 3 * | [A] - M.A.TOMAI ET AL, "The adjuvant properties of a non-toxic monophosphoryl lipid A in hyporesponsive and aging mice", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870720), vol. 107, no. 3, Database accession no. 17442, page 38, column 2 [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [ ] - J. BIOL. RESPONSE MODIF., (1987), vol. 6, no. 2, page 99-107 | [A] - J.L.BITTLE ET AL, VACCINE BIOTECHNOLOGY, SAN DIEGO, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1989) [A] 8,9 * page 321, paragraph D * | [A] - W.G.ROBEY ET AL, "Prospect for the prevention of HIV infection;purified 120-kDa envelope glycoprotein induces neutralising antibody", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., WASHINGTON US, (1986), vol. 83 [A] 7,12 * the whole document * |