EP0640441 - Device and method for enveloping a construction to be treated [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holman, Harm Willem, Drs. Koepoortstraat 17 6981 AP Doesburg / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states Holman, Harm Willem Koepoortstraat 17 NL-6981 AP Doesburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | de Wit, Gerard Frederik Octrooi- en Merkenbureau de Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | de Wit, Gerard Frederik, Ir. Octrooi- en Merkenbureau de Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 94202478.7 | 30.08.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | NL19930001491 | 31.08.1993 Original published format: NL 9301491 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640441 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B24C3/06, B63B59/06, E04G23/00 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
B24C3/062 (EP);
B63B59/06 (EP);
E04G23/002 (EP);
E04G23/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Umhüllen einer zu behandelnden Konstruktion | [1998/02] | English: | Device and method for enveloping a construction to be treated | [1995/09] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour envelopper une construction à traiter | [1995/09] |
Former [1995/09] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Umhüllen einer zu Behandelnden Konstruktion | Examination procedure | 23.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/03] | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0315500 (G.THOMANN) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 12; figure - * [Y] 20; | [YA]EP0393918 (VAPORMATT LTD.) [Y] 20 * abstract * [A] 1,7,21; | [A]GB460790 (C.LUMB) [A] 1,20 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE3402907 (G.DRESPA) [A] 1,20 * abstract * |