EP0643300 - Method and apparatus for measuring silver ion activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | For:BE
DE
FR
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:BE
DE
FR
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, Stephen John, c/o Kodak Limited Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 94202548.7 | 06.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | GB19930018677 | 09.09.1993 Original published format: GB 9318677 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643300 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
G01N27/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1995/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Silberionenaktivität | [1995/11] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring silver ion activity | [1995/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déterminer l'activité des ions d'argent | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 13.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/15] | 24.09.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS61162744 ; | [YA]JPS60211354 ; | [YA]WO9206368 (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,4,6,9,11-14 * page 10, line 2 - page 16, line 4; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,5,7,8; | [A]JPH0331753 ; | [A]US5217112 (ALMON AMY C [US]) [A] 15 * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861210), vol. 010, no. 369, Database accession no. (P - 525), & JP61162744 A 19860723 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-6,9,11-14 * abstract * [A] 7,8,10 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 86-234644 [ ] * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860322), vol. 010, no. 072, Database accession no. (P - 438), & JP60211354 A 19851023 (FURONTETSUKUSU) [Y] 1-3,5 * abstract * [A] 1,6,9-12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910425), vol. 015, no. 166, Database accession no. (P - 1195), & JP03031753 A 19910212 (NIPPON FILCON CO LTD) [A] 1,6,9-12 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 91-084704 [ ] * abstract * |