EP0643298 - Reagent dissolution in sensor systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE DSTL Porton Down Salisbury, Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states THE SECRETARY of STATE for DEFENCE in HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOVERNMENT Defence Research Agency Farnborough, Hants GU14 6TD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobson, John Vincent Hulam Cottage, Hulam Farm, Castle Eden Hartlepool, Cleveland TS27 4SA / GB | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Skelton, Stephen Richard, et al D/IPR Formalities Section Poplar 2 MoD Abbey Wood nr. 19 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Skelton, Stephen Richard, et al D/IPR DERA Formalities, Poplar 2a No. 19, MOD(PE) Abbey Wood Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | ||
Former [1995/11] | Beckham, Robert William, et al Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough R69 Building Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 94202639.4 | 13.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | GB19930018959 | 14.09.1993 Original published format: GB 9318959 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0643298 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0643298 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643298 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, B01F1/00 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
G01N1/38 (EP);
B01F21/22 (EP);
B01J8/02 (EP);
G01N35/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1995/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Auflösung von Reagenzien in einem Sensorsystem | [1995/11] | English: | Reagent dissolution in sensor systems | [1995/11] | French: | Dispositif pour la dissolution des réactifs dans un système de capteurs | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4740475 (PAUL PHILIP C [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 43 - line 68 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 31; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US3504376 (BEDNAR THOMAS F, et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 70; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4522923 (DEUTSCH ALICE [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0529155 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) |