EP0644177 - Process for the preparation of dibenzylamine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castelijns, Anna Maria Cornelia Francisca Mergelakker 24 NL-67176 JB Beek (L.) / NL | 02 /
Maas, Peter Johannes Dominicus Geleenstraat 19 NL-6155 NA Schinnen / NL | [1995/12] | Application number, filing date | 94202692.3 | 19.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | BE19930000975 | 20.09.1993 Original published format: BE 9300975 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644177 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644177 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/26 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
C07C209/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [1995/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dibenzylaminen | [1995/12] | English: | Process for the preparation of dibenzylamine | [1995/12] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de dibenzylamine | [1995/12] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 13.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9313047 (AKZO NV [NL]) [A] 1-8 * examples 1-4 * | [A] - F. KNOOP ET AL., "Beiträge zu Synthese und Abbau von Aminosäuren", Z. PHYSIOL. CHEM., (1927), vol. 107, pages 186 - 211 [A] 1-8 * page 188, paragraph 2 * * page 198 * |