EP0654774 - Traffic control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R&H Systems B.V. Industrieweg 30 NL-3361 HJ Sliedrecht / NL | [1995/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Bosch, Willem Johan Laan C.v.Cattenburch 131 C NL-2585 EZ Den Haag / NL | 02 /
de Keizer, Cornelis Assumburg 39 NL-3328 BX Dordrecht / NL | 03 /
Steeneveld, Jacob Herman Galjoen 14 NL-3232 CJ Brielle / NL | 04 /
Wijbrans, Klaas Cornelis Jan Zernickestraat 247 NL-2553 EC Hengelo / NL | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, et al HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, Ir., et al HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 94202970.3 | 14.10.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | NL19930001993 | 18.11.1993 Original published format: NL 9301993 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654774 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/017, G08G1/04 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
G08G1/0175 (EP);
G08G1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/21] | Title | German: | Verkehrsüberwachungssystem | [1995/21] | English: | Traffic control system | [1995/21] | French: | Système de surveillance du trafic | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 19.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/28] | 17.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.1998 | 31.10.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2645310 (ELSYDEL) [A] 1-7 * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2266398 (TRAFFIC TECHNOLOGY LIMITED) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4433325 (TANAKA ET AL) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * |