EP0707906 - Automatic machine for the production of gaskets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISA S.p.A. Via Roma 20 26020 Cumignano sul Naviglio (Cremona) / IT | [2001/04] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states AISA S.p.A. Via Roma 20 I-26020 Cumignano sul Naviglio (Cremona) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barozzi, Gian Piero Via Desti 7 Crema (Cremona) / IT | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Raimondi, Alfredo, et al Dott. Ing. Prof. Alfredo Raimondi S.r.l., Piazza le Cadorna 15 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Raimondi, Alfredo, Dott. Ing. Prof., et al Dott. Ing. Prof. RAIMONDI ALFREDO S.r.l. Piazzale Cadorna 15 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94203075.0 | 22.10.1994 | [1996/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707906 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707906 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/00, B21D53/18 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
B21D53/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/33] |
Former [1996/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Dichtungen | [1996/17] | English: | Automatic machine for the production of gaskets | [1996/17] | French: | Machine automatique pour la fabrication de joints | [1996/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, IE, LI, LU, PT, SE | 07.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 05.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.12.1995 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1995 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1995 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1995 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1995 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1995 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1995 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1995 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1995 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.1995 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.01.2001 | IT | 24.01.2001 | NL | 24.01.2001 | DE | 25.04.2001 | GB | 22.10.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 24.01.2001 | |
NL | 24.01.2001 | ||
DE | 25.04.2001 | ||
GB | 22.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | NL | 24.01.2001 | |
DE | 25.04.2001 | ||
FR | 22.06.2001 | ||
GB | 22.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | DE | 25.04.2001 | |
FR | 22.06.2001 | ||
GB | 22.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | DE | 25.04.2001 | |
FR | 22.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | FR | 22.06.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4946088 (SHYUE S. CHUANG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4361335 (VINCIGUERRA) |