EP0653166 - Pourable thick foundation sauce [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verenigde Coöperatieve Melkindustrie Coberco B.A. Nieuwstad 69 NL-7201 NM Zutphen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states Verenigde Coöperatieve Melkindustrie Coberco B.A. Nieuwstad 69 NL-7201 NM Zutphen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
te Roller, Johan Martinet Barlheze 27B NL-7201 JT Barlheze / NL | 02 /
van Schouwenburg, Aaltje Wytske Jantje Lavendel 3 NL-8101 CR Raalte / NL | 03 /
van den Boogaard, Cornelis Hoefslag 4 NL-7213 BW Gorssel / NL | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 94203306.9 | 11.11.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | NL19930001965 | 12.11.1993 Original published format: NL 9301965 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653166 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653166 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/24, A23L1/39, A23L1/0534 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
A23L23/00 (EP);
A23L27/60 (EP);
A23L29/262 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/20] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vergiessbarer verdickter Saucegrund | [1995/20] | English: | Pourable thick foundation sauce | [1995/20] | French: | Fond de sauce épais versable | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.1998 | CH | 28.10.1998 | GR | 28.10.1998 | IT | 28.10.1998 | LI | 28.10.1998 | IE | 28.12.1998 | DK | 28.01.1999 | GB | 28.01.1999 | PT | 28.01.1999 | SE | 28.01.1999 | MC | 31.05.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
CH | 28.10.1998 | ||
GR | 28.10.1998 | ||
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
IE | 28.12.1998 | ||
DK | 28.01.1999 | ||
GB | 28.01.1999 | ||
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
MC | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/18] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
CH | 28.10.1998 | ||
GR | 28.10.1998 | ||
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
IE | 28.12.1998 | ||
GB | 28.01.1999 | ||
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
MC | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
CH | 28.10.1998 | ||
GR | 28.10.1998 | ||
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
IE | 28.12.1998 | ||
GB | 28.01.1999 | ||
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
MC | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
CH | 28.10.1998 | ||
GR | 28.10.1998 | ||
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
IE | 28.12.1998 | ||
GB | 28.01.1999 | ||
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
MC | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
CH | 28.10.1998 | ||
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
IE | 28.12.1998 | ||
GB | 28.01.1999 | ||
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
MC | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
IE | 28.12.1998 | ||
GB | 28.01.1999 | ||
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
CH | 02.02.1999 | ||
LI | 02.02.1999 | ||
MC | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
IE | 28.12.1998 | ||
GB | 28.01.1999 | ||
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
MC | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
GB | 28.01.1999 | ||
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
MC | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
GB | 28.01.1999 | ||
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
PT | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 28.01.1999 | |
SE | 28.01.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4214009 (CHANG PEI K [US]) [A] 1-9* column W *; | [X]EP0049705 (SCM CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,9 * page 9, line 26 - line 35 * * page 10, lines 6-22 * * page 11, line 19 - line 25 * * example 3; claims 1,2,4-6 *; | [A]AU549519B (SWIFT AND CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2249467 (DOW EUROP SA [CH]) [X] 1,6,9 * example - * * page 4, line 16 - page 6, line 30 * * page 8, line 15 - line 18 * * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 14 * | [A] - J.KAMSTEEG ET AL., E = eetbaar? Alle E-nummers en de belangrijkste overige additieven, AMSTERDAM,NL, H.J.W.BECHT [A] 1,6 * pages 130-132 * E 461- E 465* |