Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0657936
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
16.08.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
15.03.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] |
24.08.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |
26.06.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.11.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
19.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.09.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] |
17.09.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] |
17.09.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] |
19.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.01.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] |
28.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.10.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.10.1997 |
First examination report |
|
18.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.01.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] |
28.04.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] |