Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3950179B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2007 | B2 | JPH07202227 | 04.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9301369 | 10.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0657936 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2001 | B1 | EP0657936 | 14.06.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE9301369 | 10.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1007865 | 07.11.1995 | A3 | Priority number | Date | BE9301369 | 10.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1041364C | 23.12.1998 | C | CN1109639 | 04.10.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9301369 | 10.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69428577T | 27.06.2002 | T2 | DE69428577D1 | 15.11.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | BE9301369 | 10.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR950021729 | 26.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9301369 | 10.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5541422 | 30.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9301369 | 10.12.1993 |